Chew thiam keng
WebChew Thiam Keng Independent Director Chairman of NC Member of AC Member of RC Mr. Chew has been on the Board since January 2000. He is the CEO of KS Energy Services Limited and is overall in charge of the Group’s operations. Prior to joining KS Energy Services Limited, he was the Executive Director of another listed company between 1996 … WebSep 7, 2024 · Chew Gek Khim chairs Straits Trading, which has interests that include real estate, hospitality and tin smelting. She took control of the company in 2008 after a …
Chew thiam keng
Did you know?
Web2. Lim Keng Jin 3. Foo Suan Sai 4. Wong Meng Yeng 5. Chew Thiam Keng 6. Ho Boon Chuan Wilson Wong Meng Yeng Independent Director, Chairman of AC, Member of RC and NC Mr Wong was appointed as a Director in January 2000. He has been an advocate and solicitor in Singapore for 25 years, with the past 19 years spent as a corporate lawyer. WebOct 29, 2024 · Ezion Holdings Limited announced the resignation of Mr. Chew Thiam Keng as the Chief Executive Officer. Mr. Chew will continue to assist in the liquidation of the Company, where required. With effect from 18 February 2024.
WebAug 4, 2024 · PRESENT DIRECTORSHIPS - CHEW THIAM KENG Name of Company or Firm Company Registration Number Nature of Interest / Director of Member Date of Appointment PHARMESIS INTERNATIONAL LTD 200309641E INDEPENDENT DIRECTOR 24 AUGUST 2004 EZION HOLDINGS LIMITED 199904364E EXECUTIVE … WebCompany Description:? Key Principal:Chew Thiam Keng See more contacts Industry:Support Activities for Water Transportation ,
Web8 years ago Chew Thiam Keng retires as Multi-Chem director He also quitted as chairman of Nominating Committee and a member of Audit Committee and Renumeration … WebKey Principal: Chew Thiam Keng See more contacts Industry: Management of Companies and Enterprises , Office Administrative Services , Investment holding companies, except …
WebMr. Chew Thiam Keng was appointed to the Board as Non-Executive Chairman on 20 February 2013 and was last re-elected on 24 April 2013. Mr. Chew is currently the Chief Executive Officer(‘CEO’) and Executive Director of Ezion Holdings Limited (‘Ezion’) and he was appointed to the Board of Ezion on 1 March 2007.
WebNov 1, 2024 · Thiam Keng Chew is currently Chief Executive Officer and Executive Director at Ezion Holdings. Thiam Keng Chew has studied at University of Hull and at National … fuel filter for mercury 60 hp bigfootWebOct 11, 2024 · Thiam Keng Chew: Non-Executive Chairman: Yee Seng Cheng: Independent Non-Executive Director: Chen Yang Lim: Independent Non-Executive Director: Simon de Villiers Rudolph: Independent Non-Executive ... gillmor student center tiffin universityWebNov 1, 2024 · Thiam Keng Chew has a Bachelor in Mechanical Engineering from National University of Singapore and a Master of Business Administration from University of Hull. They have also studied at National University of Singapore : Rowena Yeo - Johnson & Johnson. Elle Lexine Lim - Citigroup. Siew Loong Wong - Kuehne+Nagel. gillna shortsWebChew Thiam Keng Independent Director, Chairman of NC, Member of AC and RC Mr Chew has been on the Board since January 2000. He is currently the Chief Executive Officer of Ezion Holdings Limited (formerly known as Nylect Technology Limited). Prior to joining Ezion Holdings Limited, Mr Chew was the Managing Director cum CEO of KS … fuel filter for poulan chainsawWebFormer banker Chew Thiam Keng created Ezion Holdings from an electrical wire maker he bought for US$6. The company, which now provides offshore marine services to the oil and gas industry, has a … fuel filter for powerhorse pressure washerWebMr. Chew Thiam Keng was appointed to the Board as Non-Executive Chairman of the Board on 20 February 2013 and was last re-elected on 26 April 2024. Mr. Chew is currently the Chief Executive Officer and Executive Director of Ezion Holdings Limited (‘Ezion’) and he was appointed to the Board of Ezion on 1 March 2007. fuel filter for mercury outboard motorWeb8.1 RE-ELECTION OF MR. CHEW THIAM KENG – RESOLUTION 2 Resolution 2 dealt with the re-election of Mr. Chew Thiam Keng as a Director of the Company. As Mr. Chew Thiam Keng was interested in this matter, he passed the chair to Mr. Tan Ser Ko to preside Resolution 2. Mr. Tan Ser Ko informed that Mr. Chew Thiam Keng, upon re-election as … fuel filter for shindaiwa t242